skip to content

Sidiropoulos, Michael

CPSO#: 86680

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: 9058837997
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Sidiropoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sidiropoulos ( CPSO# 86680 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SIDIROPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDIROPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2014