skip to content

Shoichet, Martin James

CPSO#: 88856

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
3050 Lawrence Ave. E
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )

Business Address:
UVM Health Network-CVPH
Radiology Department
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh NY  129 1

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107


Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Shoichet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Site
100 Frank Miller
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital Site
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Business Address:
Scarborough Health Network Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTIN JAMES SHOICHET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOICHET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.