skip to content

Nesterenko, Maria

CPSO#: 89098

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Crimean State Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
243 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone: (416) 489-2106 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Oleg Safir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Safir ( CPSO# 79962 )
Dr. M. Nesterenko ( CPSO# 89098 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
600 University Avenue
Suite 476D1
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-2554


Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Nesterenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nesterenko ( CPSO# 89098 )

Business Address:
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 489-2106

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIA NESTERENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESTERENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011