skip to content

Hill, Michael James

CPSO#: 95759

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 235-7284
Fax: (905) 235-7320 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hill ( CPSO# 95759 )

Business Address:
200 - 30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 235-7284

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015