skip to content

Guo, Meiqi

CPSO#: 95947

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
10th Floor
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3944
Fax: 4165977107 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jihao Dong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dong ( CPSO# 88903 )
Dr. M. Guo ( CPSO# 95947 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEIQI GUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016