skip to content

Chui, Mario Chi-Cheung

CPSO#: 27965

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Nov 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL04
4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T7
Phone: (416) 293-5940
Fax: (416) 293-6036 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. C. Chui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chui ( CPSO# 27965 )

Business Address:
LL04 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P4
Phone Number: (416) 293-5940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIO CHI-CHEUNG CHUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1975