skip to content

Lunney, James Lantalum

CPSO#: 30673

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West End Family Care
80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Lunney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lunney ( CPSO# 30673 )

Business Address:
West End Family Care
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES LANTALUM LUNNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUNNEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979