THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:14:33 AM
Lunney, James Lantalum
CPSO#:
30673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 May 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West End Family Care
80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. James Lunney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1982 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES LANTALUM LUNNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUNNEY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 1979 |