skip to content

Lulja, Nevila

CPSO#: 87668

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Medical Health Centre
101-17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

181 Green Lane East
EAST GWILLIMBURY ONTARIO
Newmarket ON  L9N 0C9
Canada
Phone: (905) 868-9243
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lulja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lulja ( CPSO# 87668 )

Business Address:
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEVILA LULJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LULJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010