THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 16:43:51 PM
Lulja, Nevila
CPSO#:
87668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Albanian, English
Education: Universiteti i Tiranes, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
York Medical Health Centre
101-17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEVILA LULJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LULJA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2010 |