skip to content

Lukwinski, Angelina Tracy

CPSO#: 87044

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 04 Dec 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2009