THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:03:46 PM
Lukwinski, Angelina Tracy
CPSO#:
87044
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
04 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Nov 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 04 Dec 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Dec 2009 |