skip to content

Lu, Diane Janet

CPSO#: 88274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 May 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
661 University Ave, suite 1701
Toronto ON  M5G 1M1
Phone: 647-260-7221 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

15847 Northumberland County Rd 29
Warkworth ON  K0K 3K0
Canada
Phone: 705-924-2210
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

1455 Bath Road
Kingston ON  K7L 4V9
Canada
Phone: 613-545-8598
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Diane Lu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lu ( CPSO# 88274 )

Business Address:
Collings Bay Institution
1455 Bath Road
Kingston ON  K7L 4V9
Phone Number: (613) 545-8598

Business Address:
Correctional Services Canada
15847 Northumberland County Road 29
Warkworth ON  K0K 3K0
Phone Number: (705) 924-2210

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DIANE JANET LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008