THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:21:04 PM
Lu, Diane Janet
CPSO#:
88274
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Colonel By Dr
Department of National Defence
Carling Campus, 9S.1
Directorate Force Health Protection
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-901-9374
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIANE JANET LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |