skip to content

Lowe, Julia Mary

CPSO#: 88006

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jan 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Division of Endocrinology 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 23 Jan 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2017