THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:51:03 AM
Lowe, Julia Mary
CPSO#:
88006
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dundee, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Endocrinology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 23 Jan 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2017 |