skip to content

Loubani, Eman Mahmoud

CPSO#: 89648

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital, LHSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52011 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eman Loubani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Loubani ( CPSO# 89648 )

Business Address:
The Children's Hospital HLSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Comissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:10 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMAN MAHMOUD LOUBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUBANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 28 Sep 2008
EL - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2009