THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:43:51 PM
Loubani, Eman Mahmoud
CPSO#:
89648
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital, LHSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52011
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMAN MAHMOUD LOUBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUBANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 28 Sep 2008
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2009 |