skip to content

Lokhat, Mohammad Hossen

CPSO#: 21686

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Dec 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Dec 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Mar 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Dec 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohammad Hossen Lokhat to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 12, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Lokhat’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

Dr. Lokhat will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of ten months.

Dr. Lokhat will engage in professional education in primary care and medical record keeping.

Dr. Lokhat’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.