THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:25:24 AM
Lokhat, Mohammad Hossen
CPSO#:
21686
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 1968 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 12 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohammad Hossen Lokhat to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 12, 2018:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Lokhat’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
Dr. Lokhat will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of ten months.
Dr. Lokhat will engage in professional education in primary care and medical record keeping.
Dr. Lokhat’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.