skip to content

Limongelli, Fulvio Mario

CPSO#: 23298

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 1991

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Genova, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1997