THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:06:06 PM
Limongelli, Fulvio Mario
CPSO#:
23298
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Genova, 1955
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1982 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 1997 |