skip to content

Levine, Joseph David

CPSO#: 18645

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 May 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 May 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Lausanne, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph D. Levine, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2006