THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:32:48 AM
Levine, Joseph David
CPSO#:
18645
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 May 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Lausanne, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph D. Levine, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2006
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:10 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1960 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1960 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1961 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1961 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1962 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 1963 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 May 2006 |