skip to content

Levene, Donald Lyon

CPSO#: 23127

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Apr 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:21 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD LYON LEVENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2020