THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:45:08 AM
Levene, Donald Lyon
CPSO#:
23127
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD LYON LEVENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2020 |