skip to content

Leung, Desmond Daniel

CPSO#: 89029

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
4001 Leslie Street
Room 375
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Desmond Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leung ( CPSO# 89029 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
4001 Leslie Street
Room 375
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 714-2349

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DESMOND DANIEL LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2011