THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:27:57 PM
Leung, Desmond Daniel
CPSO#:
89029
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
4001 Leslie Street
Room 375
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DESMOND DANIEL LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2011 |