skip to content

Leucht, Stephan Thomas

CPSO#: 92110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Humboldt University of Berlin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterdown Pediatrics
130 - 170 Rockhaven Ln
Waterdown ON  L8B 1B5
Phone: 9056899499
Fax: 9056895284 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHAN THOMAS LEUCHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUCHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 04 Dec 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
AVP - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2019