THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:31:16 AM
Leucht, Stephan Thomas
CPSO#:
92110
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Humboldt University of Berlin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Waterdown Pediatrics
130 - 170 Rockhaven Ln
Waterdown ON L8B 1B5
Phone: 9056899499
Fax: 9056895284
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHAN THOMAS LEUCHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUCHT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 04 Dec 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
AVP - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2019 |