skip to content

Leslie, Bruno

CPSO#: 86162

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Oct 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4M3 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:13 Oct 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist
General Surgery Effective:13 Oct 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2007 to 23 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2021 Active
 1. Dr. BRUNO LESLIE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Urology, McMaster University, in which Dr. LESLIE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. LESLIE no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 13 October, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2024. Upon renewal of Dr. LESLIE's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.