THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:18:01 AM
Leslie, Bruno
CPSO#:
86162
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4M3
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:13 Oct 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
General Surgery |
Effective:13 Oct 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2007 to 23 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2021 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2021 |
|
Active |