Leonardo, John Lancelot (CPSO#: 100824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Jun 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State Univ of New York, Downstate, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Karmy Chronic Pain Medical Clinic
Suite 110
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 456-6816
Fax: (905) 456-0490
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

228 Lakeshore Rd. West
Mississauga ON  L5H1G6
Canada
Phone: 905-278-5158
Fax: 905-278-0228
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

SUITE 170
7181 YONGE ST.
Thornhill ON  L3T0C7
Canada
Phone: 416-457-7977
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leonardo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leonardo ( CPSO# 100824)

Business Address:
170 - 7181 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C7
Phone Number: (416) 457-7977

Business Address:
228 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G6
Phone Number: (905) 278-5158

Business Address:
Karmy Chronic Pain Medical Clinic
Suite 110
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 456-6816

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   John   Lancelot   Leonardo   may   practise   medicine  independently  in
            interventional pain medicine.