THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 10:26:55 AM
Leonardo, John Lancelot
CPSO#:
100824
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: State Univ of New York, Downstate, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Karmy Chronic Pain Medical Clinic
Suite 210
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 456-6816
Fax: (905) 456-0490
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:10 Jun 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2020 |
|
Active |