skip to content

Leifso, Kirk Ryan

CPSO#: 88736

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Watkins 3 Room 224
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6766
Fax: (613) 548-2453 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kirk Leifso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leifso ( CPSO# 88736 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3, Room 224
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIRK RYAN LEIFSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIFSO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 20 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2012