THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:27:14 AM
Leifso, Kirk Ryan
CPSO#:
88736
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Watkins 3 Room 224
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6766
Fax: (613) 548-2453
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Nov 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRK RYAN LEIFSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIFSO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 20 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2012 |