skip to content

Leibel, Sydney Adam

CPSO#: 99247

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kindercare Paediatrics, Suite 301, 491 Eglinton Avenue West, Toronto, ON M5N 1A8
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2015