THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:27:43 PM
Leibel, Sydney Adam
CPSO#:
99247
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kindercare Paediatrics, Suite 301, 491 Eglinton Avenue West, Toronto, ON M5N 1A8
Date Received: 25 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2015 |