skip to content

Lei, Shaobo

CPSO#: 94076

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 09 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Central South University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-978-6976 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAOBO LEI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LEI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LEI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LEI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Oct 2017
AVP - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 07 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 07 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022