THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:45:12 AM
Lei, Shaobo
CPSO#:
94076
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Central South University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2475 McDougall Street
Jackson Park Health Centre
Windsor ON N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 252-5854
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: DR. SHAOBO LEI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAOBO LEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Oct 2017
AVP - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 07 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 07 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2022 |