skip to content

Lee, Victor Ka-Hung Gar-Koung

CPSO#: 29842

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Apr 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University Of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Victor K.H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Sep 2020