THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:56:54 PM
Lee, Victor Ka-Hung Gar-Koung
CPSO#:
29842
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Apr 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Victor K.H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:05 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2020 |