skip to content

Lee, Dong Byeck

CPSO#: 22691

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. B. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 2012