THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:57:19 PM
Lee, Dong Byeck
CPSO#:
22691
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 May 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Seoul National University, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D. B. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Feb 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jan 2012 |