skip to content

Lee, Christina Dorothy

CPSO#: 86397

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Helath Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5130
Fax: (905) 813-4024 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C.D. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee ( CPSO# 86397 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA DOROTHY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
EL - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2010 to 02 Apr 2010
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010