THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:53:31 PM
Lee, Christina Dorothy
CPSO#:
86397
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Helath Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5130
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:21 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA DOROTHY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2010 to 02 Apr 2010
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2010 |