skip to content

Leatherdale, Charles Larry

CPSO#: 17965

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

East Elgin Family Health Team
424 Talbot Street West
Aylmer ON  N5H 1K9
Tel: 519-773-3715
Date Received: 29 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1961
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 May 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Mar 2013

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2004
Summary:

On January 19, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Leatherdale to have committed acts of professional misconduct that would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:

1) that Dr. Leatherdale(s certificate of registration to be suspended for a period of three (3) consecutive months, commencing on March 1, 2004 at 12:01 a.m., one (1) month of which will be suspended if Dr. Leatherdale provides evidence to the College of his successful completion of the College Boundaries course;
2) that Dr. Leatherdale attend before the Committee to be reprimanded;
3) that Dr. Leatherdale pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00
4) that the results of the proceeding be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 19, 2004