THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:49:53 AM
Leatherdale, Charles Larry
CPSO#:
17965
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:East Elgin Family Health Team
424 Talbot Street West
Aylmer ON N5H 1K9
Tel: 519-773-3715
Date Received: 29 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1961 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2004 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 May 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Mar 2013 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2004
Summary:
On January 19, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Leatherdale to have committed acts of professional misconduct that would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:
1) that Dr. Leatherdale(s certificate of registration to be suspended for a period of three (3) consecutive months, commencing on March 1, 2004 at 12:01 a.m., one (1) month of which will be suspended if Dr. Leatherdale provides evidence to the College of his successful completion of the College Boundaries course;
2) that Dr. Leatherdale attend before the Committee to be reprimanded;
3) that Dr. Leatherdale pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00
4) that the results of the proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 19, 2004