skip to content

Lear, Naomi Diane

CPSO#: 87128

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1600-510 5 St SW
Calgary AB  T2P 3S2

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naomi Diane Lear Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Fairlawn Medical Clinic Suite 209 2401 Yonge Street Toronto ON M4P 3H1 Phone: (416) 322-9933 Fax: (416) 322-7097
Date Received: 11 Oct 2012


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAOMI DIANE LEAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2022