THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:13:32 AM
Lear, Naomi Diane
CPSO#:
87128
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1600-510 5 St SW
Calgary AB T2P 3S2
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Naomi Diane Lear Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Fairlawn Medical Clinic
Suite 209
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 322-9933
Fax: (416) 322-7097
Date Received: 11 Oct 2012
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAOMI DIANE LEAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2022 |